TWEENIE TOTS 2 PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a not for profit parent lead, community based chilcare service providing a fun, play/educational environment that is an affordable, low cost, flexible, and accessible service. Every child between the ages of 2 and 11 years shall have the opportunity to join our group regardless of gender, class, family status, means, ability/disability, colour, ethnic origin, culture, religion or belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 23 August 2006: Standard registration
- 28 November 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 November 2011: Funds transferred to 1136119 TWEENIE TOTS 2 COMMUNITY CHILDCARE SERVICES LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.42k | £56.20k | £134.33k | £172.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.86k | £75.25k | £94.79k | £136.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 09 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 31 March 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE PLAYGROUP IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS. B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, MERSEYSIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window