Financial history ADRENALINE ALLEY

Charity number: 1115146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.36m £602.47k £1.12m £1.07m £1.28m
Total expenditure £889.57k £642.47k £879.16k £1.06m £1.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £288.47k £164.85k £147.36k £32.48k £1.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £424.01k £38.14k £137.46k £116.10k £128.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £884.85k £527.94k £926.52k £890.01k £1.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40.35k £34.56k £51.03k £54.39k £55.44k
Income - Other £9.32k £1.83k £7.37k £13.26k £6.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £889.57k £642.47k £879.16k £1.06m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £71.11k £21.71k £19.44k £22.32k £21.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £26.16k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0