Financial history IRANIAN ADVISORY & SUPPORT AGENCY

Charity number: 1115126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £3.85k £4.95k £4.79k £4.85k £4.25k
Total expenditure £3.80k £4.90k £4.72k £4.75k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A