WORLD REPAIRERS GLOBAL NETWORK AKA CHRIST THE REPAIRER'S MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrines appearing in the schedule attached to the constitution in particular but not exclusively through the provision of missionary work worldwide and to relieve financial hardship of the poor and underprivileged worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
- CHRIST THE REPAIRERS MINISTRY (Working name)
- WRGCN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pelumi Olusegun Adeyemo | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olufemi Adetunji Awodele | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adebayo Solomom Asogba | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Awele Mogoli | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN PEREIRA | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|||||
ADETAYO ADEPOJU | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHEAL SOFOWORA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Olabode Makoyawo | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.53k | £36.31k | £33.23k | £41.51k | £16.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.43k | £41.23k | £54.17k | £41.06k | £16.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 31 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO THE CONSTITUTION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MISSIONARY WORK WORLDWIDE; AND 2. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THE POOR AND UNDERPRIVILEGED WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
Bel Air Court
144 High Street
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 7EL
- Phone:
- 07950709631
- Email:
- repairersfocus@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window