Trustees Norfolk and Waveney Mind

Charity number: 1118449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Jayne Gray Chair 26 February 2025
None on record
ALASTAIR PETER KENNEDY ROY Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Dr Abeku Mensah Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
DOCTOR CHRIS GRIBBLE Trustee 13 December 2023
None on record
James Ingham Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Namita Matkar Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Julian Lloyd Steed Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Graham George Goodwin Trustee 02 July 2019
None on record
Nick Francis Trustee 15 February 2017
NORWICH ROWING CLUB
Received: On time