THE RICHARD BURNS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation has raised money at various motor sport events and has made donations to charities which focus on enhancing the lives of children and young people who are suffering from serious disability or illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 2006: Standard registration
- 25 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1173285 SPINAL TRACK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.11k | £33.03k | £128.25k | £136.51k | £107.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.51k | £89.99k | £141.71k | £144.55k | £187.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 28 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 13 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 13 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS OR SERIOUS INJURY; 2 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LIFE THREATENING OR SERIOUS MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR INJURY BY THE PROVISION OF GOODS OR SERVICES NOT OTHERWISE AVAILABLE FROM THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND REHABILITATION; 3 TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS AND SERIOUS INJURY WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THOSE INVOLVED IN MOTOR SPORT; 4 TO PROMOTE AND AID RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND PREVENTION OF LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS AND SERIOUS INJURY WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THOSE INVOLVED IN MOTOR SPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window