RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To meet the social and cultural needs of the local community To improve the quality of life of users of the Centre To actively support local groups from all cultures, and provide a base for their activities To support the relief of poverty To support the advancement of eduction To encourage integration To support Ravidassia principles of equality, justice, social freedom and charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAN LAL TOORA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Manoj Kalair | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vijai Mehar | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sangeeta Mehar | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prianka Sidhu | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Meena Kamal | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA DEVI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MAK MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEHMBER CHAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIJAI MEHAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAJ CHAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
SITA SIDHU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TEJ KAUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIDYA MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJINDER KUMAR PAWAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.81k | £31.24k | £21.78k | £21.08k | £35.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.24k | £21.64k | £25.37k | £15.18k | £32.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £907 | £25.00k | N/A | £3.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CARRYING ON OF COMMUNITY CENTRE AND THE DOING OF ALL SUCH THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THAT OBJECT. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; 3.4 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE AREA, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE; 3.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SRI GURU RAVIDIDASS JI.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE, HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY CENTRE
2-4 KNOWL PIECE
WILBURY WAY
HITCHIN
SG4 0TY
- Phone:
- 01462442877
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window