CAMDY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds through selling donated items to support costs of transporting donated clothing, educational toys and books given in aid of disadvantaged children in the Caribbean
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Trinidad And Tobago
Governance
- 26 July 2006: Standard registration
- 08 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2016 | 01/11/2017 | 01/11/2018 | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.30k | £9.30k | £694 | £536 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 29 October 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2018 | 27 January 2020 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING ADOLESCENT MOTHERS LIVING IN THE CARIBBEAN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF RECYCLED TOYS, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND OTHER RECYCLED GOODS AND THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE
Area of benefit
CARIBBEAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window