Trustees LONDON FUNDERS
Charity number: 1116201

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny North | Chair | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Marie Leech | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shahnaz LeShaun Biggs | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Latham | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Guyton | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Andrea Barry | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Corrigan | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tunde Olayinka | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Stephen Briant | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Aslam | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ugochukwu Kodilinye Chiedozie Ikokwu | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edith Galliers | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Kathryn Cooney | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rebecca Dickinson | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Catherine Burgess | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.