Financial history THE INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL MOSHI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1115221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.07k £9.10k £4.48k £1.64k £6.94k
Total expenditure £60 £63 £96 £96 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A