FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF SAINT LAWRENCE GNOSALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a fund raising charity with the sole purpose of helping to maintain the fabric, fixtures and fittings of the listed St Lawrence Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE REDFERN | Chair | 24 August 2005 |
|
|||||
Colin Victor Brown | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Peters-Brown | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Hailes | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Norman Hailes | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY AIR | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WINFIELD | Trustee | 24 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
SANDY REDFERN | Trustee | 24 August 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.82k | £5.74k | £2.56k | £4.46k | £12.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.26k | £3.47k | £3.73k | £409 | £16.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH GNOSALL, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTING, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS BELONGING TO THE CHURCH, ITS CHURCHYARDS AND ITS SURROUNDINGS WHILST TAKING INTO ACCOUNT THE MODERN-DAY NEEDS OF PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
GNOSALL, STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOLEY GATE FARM
DOLEY GATE
GNOSALL
STAFFORD
ST20 0EH
- Phone:
- 01785 822440
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window