Accounts and annual returns LUMINAR (BARNSLEY)

Charity number: 1117989
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 June 2017 On Time