Financial history LUMINAR (BARNSLEY)

Charity number: 1117989
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £128.76k £154.50k £164.17k £134.66k £811
Total expenditure £109.31k £154.82k £154.54k £150.92k £56.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A