TENDRING REUSE AND EMPLOYMENT ENTERPRISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
T.R.E.E. Project is a unique initiative to establish a reuse/recycling partnership within the Essex area. The project's committed to the reuse/recycling of WEEE & furniture. The project creates local opportunities for volunteering, participation in training, work experience and enhanced employment opportunities with particular emphasis on provision for people with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Total income includes £17,125 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 16 August 2006: Standard registration
- Community Reuse And Training Essex (Working name)
- TENDRING REUSE AND EMPLOYMENT ENTERPRISE (Working name)
- TREE (Working name)
- Reuse And Employment Ltd (Previous name)
- TENDRING REUSE AND EMPLOYMENT ENTERPRISE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIPPA KEY | Chair | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Louise Fenlon | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN PENN | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.06k | £83.18k | £430.39k | £243.85k | £17.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.26k | £41.89k | £98.74k | £200.27k | £191.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £17.13k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF TENDRING, ESSEX AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY: (I) COLLECTING, TESTING, REPAIRING AND/OR REFURBISHING FOR RE-USE WHITE GOODS, AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS INCLUDING PAINT AND FURNITURE, AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE AT AN AFFORDABLE COST, OR FREE, TO INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE ON LOW INCOMES OR WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED OR SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF HARDSHIP, POVERTY, ILL-HEALTH OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR HANDICAP; AND (II) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WHO ARE SUFFERING OR DISADVANTAGED BECAUSE OF LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, UNEMPLOYMENT, MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS OR THROUGH BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED (THE "WORKERS"), BY THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM SUCCESSFULLY TO SEEK GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT: (I) AMONG THE WORKERS, BY THE PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES, WORK AND TRAINING TO ENABLE THE WORKERS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS TO PROVIDE THEM WITH ADDITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, CONFIDENCE AND FULFILMENT AND ENHANCE THEIR EMPLOYMENT PROSPECTS; (II) AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, REGARDING THE BENEFITS OF PROTECTING AND PRESERVING THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE IMPLEMENTATION AND PROMOTION OF ENVIRONMENTALLY-FRIENDLY SCHEMES AND POLICIES, THE RECYCLING OF WHITE GOODS, RECYCLING SCRAP MATERIAL INTO ART MATERIALS AND RECLYCING PAINT THAT WOULD OTHERWISE GO TO LANDFILL; AND (III) AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, ASSISTING IN THE ARTISTIC EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF LOCAL COMMUNITY AND YOUTH GROUPS BY THE PROVISION OF FREE ARTS AND CRAFTS MATERIALS MADE FROM RECYCLED SCRAP MATERIAL (C) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY; (I) THE PROVISION OF A RECYCLING AND DISPOSAL SERVICE FOR WHITE GOODS, SCRAP MATERIALS (INCLUDING PLASTIC, PAPER, METAL AND CARDBOARD) AND HOUSEHOLD PAINT THAT WOULD OTHERWISE GO TO LANDFILL AND THEREBY PROMOTING WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE, RECLAMATION, RECYCLING AND USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND SURPLUS PARTS; AND (II) EXPLORING FURTHER RE-USE AND RECYCLING INITIATIVES AND ADOPTING OR PROMOTING INITIATIVES WHICH WILL CONTRIBUTE TO LOCAL WASTE MANAGEMENT AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE BENEFITS OF DOMESTIC GARDENING (D) EDUCATING AND INFORMING THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE BENEFITS OF PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE ENVIRONMENT, SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLES AND THE BENEFITS TO THE COMMUNITY OF RECYCLING, RE-USE AND ENVIRONMENTALLY-FRIENDLY WASTE MANAGEMENT
Area of benefit
TENDRING AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Thirtle Close
Clacton-on-Sea
CO16 8YH
- Phone:
- 01255751549
- Email:
- admin@tree1.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window