Financial history Home Start Warrington and Cheshire

Charity Number: 1116515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £149.65k £161.84k £178.00k £239.04k £286.40k
Total expenditure £138.18k £156.74k £190.00k £275.50k £310.41k
Income from government contracts £23.44k £23.44k N/A £23.44k £27.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.44k £23.44k £27.00k