CENTRAL VALMIKI SABHA INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Relief of Poverty Overseas aid/Famine relief Religious activities Arts/culture Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- CENTRAL VALMIKI SABNA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 19 July 2008 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1) 'TO ADVANCE THE VALMIKI RELIGION THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF BHAGWAN MAHARISHI VALMIKI JI AND THE HOLY SCRIPTURES OF THE RAMAYANA THE YOG VASISHTHA, THE ASHKAR-LASHKAR, SHRI RAM SAMWADA AND OTHER TEXTS OF BHAGWAN MAHRISHI VALMIK JI'. 2) 'TO EDUCATE IN THE VALMIKI RELIGIOUS FAITH AND CULTURE PARTICULARLY FOR THE YOUNGER GENERATION OF THE VALMIKI COMMUNITY AND TO PROMOTE THE ELIMINATION OF SOCIAL RACIAL AND CASTE DISCRIMINATION' 3) TO ORGANISE, PROMOTE AND FACILITATE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE VALMIKI COMMUNITY AND OF BHAGWAN MAHRISHIV VALMIKI JI AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC' 4) 'TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE VALMIKI COMMUNITY AND TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, IRRESPECTIVE OF COLOUR, GENDER, POLITICAL OPINION, NATIONALITY, DISABILITY, RELIGION, CASTE OR RACE' 5) TO ORGANISE, PROMOTE AND FACILITATE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE VALMIKI COMMUNITY AND OF BHAGWAN MAHRISHIV VALMIKI JI AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC' 6)'TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE VALMIKI COMMUNITY AND TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, IRRESPECTIVE OF COLOUR, GENDER, POLITICAL OPINION, NATIONALITY, DISABILITY, RELIGION, CASTE OR RACE'
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window