Accounts and annual returns HEALING HANDS TO MATARA

Charity Number: 1116364
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 12 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 27 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 15 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 10 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required