Financial history HEALING HANDS TO MATARA

Charity number: 1116364
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014
Total gross income £10.44k £9.16k £6.69k £8.64k £126
Total expenditure £7.97k £7.59k £8.35k £10.98k £752
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A