HEALING HANDS TO MATARA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to assist in the provision of housing, education etc to the women and children who live near Matara, Sri Lanka
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 11 October 2006: Standard registration
- 20 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.44k | £9.16k | £6.69k | £8.64k | £126 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £7.59k | £8.35k | £10.98k | £752 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 12 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 15 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 10 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
* THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF ADULTS (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WOMEN) AND CHILDREN IN MATARA SRI LANKA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WOMEN) AND CHILDREN IN MATARA SRI LANKA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
MATARA SRI LANKA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window