ST PETER'S PAVILION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sporting and recreational facilities to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||
Pamela Jane Daily | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK ALLEN | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHNSON HURST | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|||||
JAMES WILLIAM WHISKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARCIA JUNE FARRIMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVERILL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.32k | £226.27k | £215.75k | £259.85k | £324.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.84k | £166.52k | £206.45k | £281.25k | £337.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HINDLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HINDLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING RUGBY AND CRICKET; 3) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN HINDLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BE REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; C) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; D) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
HINDLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Pavilion Ltd
Hurst Street
Hindley
Wigan
WN2 3DN
- Phone:
- 01942521381
- Email:
- info@stpeterspavilion.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window