LIFE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reaching and serving the poorest of the poor in India, through children's homes, schools, training, and medical provision. Our work has a particular focus on children and the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Louise Wooldridge | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Ian Haskett | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Judith Graham | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Lewis Dent | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael James Finnegan | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.53k | £131.36k | £203.32k | £134.04k | £128.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.61k | £131.11k | £191.50k | £141.09k | £110.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ORPHANS IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND THE SETTING UP AND RUNNING OF ORPHANAGES WHICH WILL PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION AND CARE; AND 2. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ORPHANAGES IN INDIA AND THE NEED FOR MORE CARE
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas Parish Centre
135 Caunce Street
BLACKPOOL
FY1 3NJ
- Phone:
- 07949891895
- Email:
- info@lifeassociation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window