HAMPSHIRE COALITION OF DISABLED PEOPLE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CAMPAIGNING ORGANISATION FOR THE RIGHTS OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN HAMPSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 July 2006: Standard registration
- 25 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.26k | £12.06k | £177.24k | £31.14k | £15.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315.73k | £97.84k | £241.82k | £74.58k | £25.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 June 2012 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 23 March 2011 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 April 2010 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 April 2010 | 85 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR: A TO PROMOTE THE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN SECURING THE NECESSARY FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO ENSURE MAXIMUM CHOICE THROUGH FULL INCLUSION INTO ALL ASPECTS OF SOCIETY. B TO REPRESENT DISABLED PEOPLE IN HAMPSHIRE FROM ALL WALKS OF LIFE, ALL POLITICAL PERSUASIONS AND ALL VIEWPOINTS WITHOUT BIAS AND MAKE EVERY EFFORT TO ENSURE A FAIR CONSIDERATION OF ALL DISABLED MEMBERS, THEIR VIEWS AND THEIR ASPIRATIONS ON A NON-PART POLITICAL AND NON-SECTARIAN BASIS.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window