THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH DEREHAM

Charity number: 1115389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion by the restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement and beautification of the Parish Church of St Nicholas Dereham in the Diocese of Norwich, and of the monuments, fittings, fixtures, stained glass, furniture, ornaments and chattels in the Church and Churchyard belonging to the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £650
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PAUL CUBITT Chair 24 August 2020
CHARITY OF THOMAS BULLOCK
Received: On time
NORTH BRECKLAND YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE AND HEADBOROUGH CHARITY
Received: On time
EAST DEREHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 541 days
David Song Trustee 06 April 2024
None on record
Susan Irenie Quinnell Trustee 06 April 2024
None on record
MARION JOAN MORGAN Trustee 20 July 2022
EAST DEREHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 541 days
THE NORTH ELMHAM YOUTH AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
SHEILA HANMER Trustee 20 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE AND HEADBOROUGH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15 £15 £15 £0 £650
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2022 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Church House
Church Street
DEREHAM
Norfolk
NR19 1DN
Phone:
01362693143
Website:

No information available