Financial history NEPAL YOUTH FOUNDATION-UK (NYF-UK)

Charity number: 1115394
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £158.49k £164.68k £769.14k £435.61k £313.63k
Total expenditure £144.77k £147.35k £651.36k £568.23k £331.25k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £769.14k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £135.06k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A