Financial history MEIR HEATH WINDMILL PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity Number: 1115772
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £300 £886 £614 £0 £0
Total expenditure £260 £869 £616 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A