MICKLEFIELD MATTERS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Due to a successful Lottery bid in partnership with Bucks County Council, the council resumed responsibility for the Library and construction of the New Building. Micklefield Matters will be wound up as County will be responsible the new facility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 03 October 2006: Standard registration
- 07 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MICKLEFIELD MATTERS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £293 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.97k | £2.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 03 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 31 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 28 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MICKLEFIELD, RYEMEAD AND TOTTERIDGE PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THE PROVISION, FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION OF BOOKS AND INFORMATION CARRIED BY OTHER ELECTRONIC MEANS OR OTHER NON-PAPER MEDIA
Area of benefit
MICKLEFIELD, RYEMEAD AND TOTTERRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window