THE TOPSY FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Topsy Foundation UK's main aim is to assist the work of the Topsy Foundation, South Africa, a registered charity in that country. Topsy SA partners with rural communities in South Africa, in which many people have been affected by HIV and AIDS. There is a specific emphasis on children and their families through medical care, food security and the training of pre-school teachers and staff .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 July 2006: Standard registration
- THE TOPSY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Adam Ghosh | Chair | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hugh Edward Montgomery | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Rae Murphy | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Louise Huber | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Foszia Turner-Stylianou | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Angoy | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFF RODRIGUES | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.10k | £25.31k | £20.32k | £21.18k | £22.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.94k | £22.39k | £19.66k | £22.43k | £22.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
A TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN SOUTH AFRICA SUFFERING FROM THE CONSEQUENCES OF HIV AND AIDS; AND B TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT HIV AND AIDS, ITS TRANSMISSION, PREVENTION AND CONSEQUENCES; C TO PROVIDE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING) TO ASSIST IN THE SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE IN SOUTH AFRICA AND IN PARTICULAR OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN THAT COUNTRY. IN EACH CASE BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND OTHER MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR ORGANISATIONS BASED IN SOUTH AFRICA INCLUDING THE TOPSY FOUNDATION, SOUTH AFRICA.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
William Sturges Llp
14-16 Caxton Street
LONDON
SW1H 0QY
- Phone:
- 07765671277
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window