THE TIANA HONEY WATSON CHARITABLE TRUST FUND FOR CHILDRENS' RARE DISEASES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Fund are to relieve the needs of children who suffer with mitochondrial disease and other metabolic diseases and disorders and their families and to raise awareness of such conditions and the promotion of research into the cause and treatment of mitochondrial disease and other metabolic diseases and disorders on terms that the useful results of such research are published.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2006: Standard registration
- TCHARMED (Working name)
- THE TIANA HONEY WATSON CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WATSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Neil Wormsley | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Candice Watson | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE JAKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.24k | £1.14k | £189 | £1.03k | £263 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.89k | £4.46k | £431 | £1.81k | £308 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 662 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 662 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1027 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1027 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1392 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1392 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WHO SUFFER WITH MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AND OTHER METABOLIC DISEASES AND DISORDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO RAISE AWARENESS OF SUCH CONDITIONS. 2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF MITOCHONORIAL DISEASE AND OTHER METABOLIC DISEASES AND DISORDERS ON TERMS THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Old Brickfield Cottages
Broad Platt
Rotherfield Greys
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 4PB
- Phone:
- 07768750048
- Email:
- mitohelp@tcharmed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window