Accounts and annual returns PALESTINE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILDRENS ENCOURAGEMENT OF SPORTS

Charity number: 1117085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window