ANTIOCH - A CENTRE FOR ANTIOCHIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN STUDIES AND RESEARCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Translating,cataloguing, and publishing manuscripts pertaining to the patrimony of the Greek Orthodox Patriarchate of Antioch. Organising conferences and other activities to promote awareness of this field of studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
- Lebanon
Governance
- 29 September 2006: Standard registration
- 04 February 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 February 2016: Funds transferred to 1011775 ARAM
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.31k | £3.91k | £3.93k | £3.33k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £0 | £420 | £9.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 22 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 22 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 24 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN HISTORY, CULTURE AND SOCIETY OF THE RUM ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE OF ANTIOCH. 2 TO ACQUIRE, HOLD, RESTORE AND MAINTAIN INFORMATION, ARTEFACTS, VESTMENTS, ACCOUTREMENTS, ARCHIVES, LIBRARIES AND PROPERTY OF HISTORICAL OR CULTURAL SIGNIFICANCE ELATING TO THE RUM ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE OF ANTIOCH. 3 TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON THE RUM ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE OF ANTIOCH IN GENERAL, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window