Accounts and annual returns ASTON CLINTON U3A

Charity number: 1115424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 19 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required