Financial history ASTON CLINTON U3A

Charity number: 1115424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.31k £7.17k £35.63k £50.58k £55.70k
Total expenditure £12.48k £8.96k £35.75k £47.67k £54.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A