Financial history NUEVAS ESPERANZAS UK

Charity number: 1116109
Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £69.94k £58.96k £64.02k £64.04k £48.59k
Total expenditure £81.09k £75.36k £65.52k £60.41k £56.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A