Financial history HOPLITE FUND

Charity number: 1116376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £340.83k £122.97k £355.49k £400.27k £444.42k
Total expenditure £122.61k £245.43k £75.14k £318.09k £576.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A