Financial history HFC Help For Children UK LTD

Charity Number: 1116081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £417.11k £118.75k £389.02k £348.39k £482.19k
Total expenditure £450.94k £200.84k £279.49k £455.27k £432.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A