CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH NEW TESTAMENT ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities Advancement of Education Relieving of Poverty Creating of Awareness Advice and Counselling Helping other Charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
- Portsmouth City
- Sandwell
- Canada
- Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 07 August 2006: Standard registration
- CACNTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND STEPHEN OLADIPUPO OLUWASOLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DCN OLORUNFEMI SUNDAY OPOOLA | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DCN ALEXANDER EJIT JONATHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dcn ADESOJI AMOS ADEKANLE | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABIODUN HEZEKIAH OLUWASOLA | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND EZEKIEL ADE ADEOSUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.95k | £205.65k | £279.83k | £429.88k | £446.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.91k | £205.43k | £277.05k | £427.91k | £445.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH TENETS AND BELIEF OF CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Third Floor
28-30 Victoria Street
LUTON
- Phone:
- 07908247460
- Email:
- cacntaluton@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
cacnta.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window