FUND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF JUNGIAN PSYCHOANALYSIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance in the treatment and care of persons suffering from mental illness of any description or in need of rehabilitation as a result of such illness, by the provision of education and training of mental health workers to international standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 July 2006: Standard registration
- THE RUSSIAN REVIVAL FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lise Misser Berg | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PENNY PICKLES | Trustee | 08 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAN WIENER | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE STEPHANIE CROWTHER | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH KUTEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PRAMILA BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCINDA HELENA HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.13k | £590 | £0 | £1.28k | £631 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.44k | £9.18k | £8.27k | £24.64k | £36.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF MENTAL HEALTH WORKERS TO INTERNATIONAL STANDARDS.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 THE GROVE
EDGWARE
HA8 9QB
- Phone:
- 07976233306
- Email:
- grants@fajp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window