SUZANNE'S MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and relieve persons who are in a condition of need, by equiping young men with training and bicycles to go out to remote villages, to bring relief teaching to help bring them out of poverty, and by providing orphanages and schools in deprived and remote areas in the World. To provide a UK based retreat for Christians to explore and renew their faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 01 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC CHARLES WOODWARD | Chair | 14 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Jean Claire Woodward | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wilfrid Daile Pillans | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vincent James Altamura | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE PILLANS | Trustee | 27 March 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.88k | £27.64k | £52.38k | £26.69k | £11.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.55k | £18.29k | £50.02k | £24.41k | £16.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF STANDLAKE RANCH AS A CHRISTIAN CENTRE IN WITNEY, OXFORDSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA, THE PHILIPPINES AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF BIBLE SCHOOLS IN WITNEY, OXFORDSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA, THE PHILIPPINES AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF ORPHANAGES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA, THE PHILIPPINES AND THE WORDS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN WITNEY, OXFORDSHIRE, AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA, THE PHILIPPINES AND THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANDLAKE RANCH
DOWNS ROAD
STANDLAKE
WITNEY
OXFORDSHIRE
OX29 7UH
- Phone:
- 01865300099
- Email:
- suzannesministries@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window