Financial history MICAHS CALL INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1116897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.52k £17.76k £11.63k £13.00k £12.51k
Total expenditure £10.65k £11.85k £16.45k £13.88k £12.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A