Financial history CRESSEX COMMUNITY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1115420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £138.57k £104.91k £186.04k £254.23k £188.48k
Total expenditure £117.43k £98.31k £184.15k £247.82k £194.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 N/A N/A N/A N/A