THE CARNE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist young people in the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 August 2006: Standard registration
- 04 May 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1186940 JERMYN STREET THEATRE
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1173667 London Performing Academy of Music c.i.o
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1148028 MAGGINI QUARTET CHARITABLE FUND
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 274755 NATIONAL OPERA STUDIO
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1192503 NEW SINFONIA
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1080948 OUTSIDE EDGE THEATRE COMPANY
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 312819 THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART
- THE RICHARD CARNE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE RICHARD CARNE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £625.99k | £412.70k | £420.82k | £2.73k | £200.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £538.02k | £754.22k | £465.16k | £478.17k | £243.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £610.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £610.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £530.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £521.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 AUG 2006 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PERSONS; AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window