THE MUSIC REPRIEVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ARTS ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2006: Standard registration
- THE MUSIC REPREVAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Michael Gilliver | Trustee | 28 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBIN HAYDON DARWALL-SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD BENET JAMES DISNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £2.36k | £2.35k | £8.71k | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £1.10k | £3.94k | £5.30k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 17 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP, AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) OF MUSIC BY COMPOSERS NO LONGER LIVING WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES DESERVES TO BE BETTER KNOWN, BY FINANCIALLY ASSISTING OR OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE GIVING OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, AND BY SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 FAIRACRES ROAD
OXFORD
OX4 1TH
- Phone:
- 01865200437
- Email:
- rdarwallsmith@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window