JET JOBS EDUCATION AND TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice guidance and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £246,881 from 6 government contract(s) and £107,519 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Stephen WALDIE | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justine Claire King | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manish Shukla | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Nairn | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hardus le Cornu du Plessis | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.02k | £368.92k | £486.71k | £467.72k | £381.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.82k | £337.73k | £414.46k | £426.24k | £376.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £98.69k | £139.03k | £359.59k | £371.11k | £246.88k | |
|
Income from government grants | £188.56k | N/A | £66.37k | £75.06k | £107.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 07 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT, SPECIFICALLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PERSONS FOR ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, SO AS TO HELP THEM ADVANCE IN LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE NORTH OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
JET Jobs Education and Training
Carnegie Building
Atkinson Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 8XS
- Phone:
- 01912735761
- Email:
- julie22@jetnorth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window