Trustees JET JOBS EDUCATION AND TRAINING

Charity number: 1117026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ross Stephen WALDIE Chair 22 November 2021
None on record
Justine Claire King Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Dr Manish Shukla Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Sean Nairn Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Hardus le Cornu du Plessis Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record