CARDIFF BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Come and sing Nov 2023 Eglwys Dewi Sant Cardiff Christmas Concert Dec 2023 at local school Winter Concert Jan 2024 Llandaff Cathedral Summer Concert June 2024 All Saints Church Penarth LLandaff Festival as part of the Festival Chorus
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Italy
Governance
- 21 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Smith | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor paul cantrill | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ABEL | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Masters | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Lewis | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Davies | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris PARSONS | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE SUSAN DANIEL | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.80k | £2.06k | £19.17k | £22.27k | £17.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.38k | £4.53k | £28.30k | £20.87k | £16.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 07 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE CHOIR ARE TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC AND TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC THROUGH PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CARDIFF, VALE OF GLAMORGAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 HEATH PARK AVENUE
CARDIFF
CF14 3RG
- Phone:
- 07714236481
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window