CALABASH TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE TOWNSHIP COMMUNITIES OF THE PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA, BY IDENTIFYING AND SUPPORTING SELF SUSTAINING NUTRITIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND EMPOWERING ENTERPRISE PROJECTS AND ALSO TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TOWNSHIP COMMUNITIES AND IN THE UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 21 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Gate | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Norman | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Easton | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Graham Griffin | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gerald Acher | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL MARY PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WEATHERLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.27k | £4.39k | £12.96k | £6.85k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.90k | £7.07k | £8.32k | £5.95k | £15.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE TOWNSHIP COMMUNITIES OF NELSON MANDELA BAY AREA, PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA; AND 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTH AFRICA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Mount Charles Crescent
Alloway
AYR
KA7 4NY
- Phone:
- 07789772331
- Email:
- calabashtrustUK@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window