ALTARNUN PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide pre-school education for children 2 years to primary school age in the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income includes £27,384 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 September 2006: Standard registration
- 20 January 2017: Funds received from 1137132 COOMBE VALLEY EGLOSKERRY LTD
- 29 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.92k | £33.50k | £31.38k | £42.71k | £36.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.31k | £37.05k | £31.73k | £35.20k | £39.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.26k | £24.86k | £1 | £33.09k | £27.38k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 126 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 491 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 491 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 February 2022 | 588 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 February 2022 | 588 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window