THE MAKASA RURAL DEVELOPMENT SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty in Zambia and Central Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Zambia
Governance
- 17 August 2006: Standard registration
- 12 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE MAKASA AGRICULTURAL DEVELOPMENT SCHEME (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £120 | £165 | £60 | £60 | |
|
Total expenditure | £115 | £120 | £135 | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 March 2021 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 23 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 18/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN AFRICA AND PRIMARILY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING, THE NORTHERN REGION OF THE REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FOOD, WATER, HEALING, CLOTHING, SHELTER, TRAINING, EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC AMENITIES AND INFRASTRUCTURE, AND THE MEANS TO DEVELOP AND PROVIDE THEIR OWN SUCH RESOURCES ALL OF WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL AND EASTERN AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window