Trustees Home-Start Bristol and South Gloucestershire
Charity number: 1116207

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Storey | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Roberts | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Fletcher | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Essi Pentti | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Leech | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Pachon | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Oliver | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Potter | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Deegan | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Leonard | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA DIANA HUNTER | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.