Financial history HOOK NORTON CARE GROUP LTD

Charity Number: 1117635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £922 £2 £1 £2.38k £109
Total expenditure £223 £393 £13 £2.66k £868
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A